There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

State Marriage Defense Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 1 of title 1, United States Code, with regard to the definition of "marriage" and "spouse" for Federal purposes and to ensure respect for State regulation of marriage.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/10/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/10/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/10/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/10/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/12/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/12/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/12/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/26/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/02/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 03/02/2015
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/02/2015
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/23/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/23/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 03/23/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/26/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/23/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/24/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/08/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/03/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/10/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice03/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.824. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/10/2015)

State Marriage Defense Act of 2015

Prohibits, in determining the meaning of any Act of Congress or of any ruling, regulation, or interpretation of U.S. administrative bureaus and agencies as applied with respect to individuals domiciled in a state or in any other territory or possession of the United States: (1) the term "marriage" from including any relationship that the state, territory, or possession does not recognize as a marriage; and (2) the term "spouse" from including an individual who is a party to a relationship that is not recognized as a marriage by that state, territory, or possession.