There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Health Care Safety Net Enhancement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve access to emergency medical services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/10/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/13/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/10/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/10/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (111)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/10/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 02/10/2015
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/24/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/24/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 02/24/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/24/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/03/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/03/2015
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/03/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/03/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/03/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/14/2015
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/14/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/14/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/14/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/14/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/14/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/14/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 04/14/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/14/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/14/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/16/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/16/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/16/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/22/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/22/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/14/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 05/14/2015
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 05/14/2015
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/02/2015
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/02/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/02/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/02/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/02/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/02/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 06/18/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/18/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/18/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 06/18/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/18/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/18/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/18/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/09/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/09/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/09/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/09/2015
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/09/2015
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/09/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/14/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 07/22/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/22/2015
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/22/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/22/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/22/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/22/2015
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/23/2015
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/28/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/29/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/09/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/18/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/25/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/25/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/25/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 10/01/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/21/2015
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 10/27/2015
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 10/27/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/03/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 11/03/2015
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 11/18/2015
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/18/2015
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 11/18/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/05/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/11/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 04/12/2016
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 04/18/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/11/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/12/2016
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/18/2016
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/24/2016
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 05/25/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/31/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/31/2016
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 06/08/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/08/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/10/2016
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/10/2016
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/07/2016
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 11/15/2016
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/18/2015 07/27/2015 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/10/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/13/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.836. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/10/2015)

Health Care Safety Net Enhancement Act of 2015

Amends the Public Health Service Act to deem a hospital or an emergency department and a physician or physician group of a hospital or emergency department to be an employee of the Public Health Service with liability protection provided by the United States for purposes of any civil action that may arise due to providing emergency and post-stabilization services on or after January 1, 2016.