There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Puerto Rico Chapter 9 Uniformity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 11 of the United States Code to treat Puerto Rico as a State for purposes of chapter 9 of such title relating to the adjustment of debts of municipalities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/11/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 10/06/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/06/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/06/2015
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 10/06/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/06/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/06/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 10/06/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/06/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/06/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/06/2015
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/06/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/06/2015
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/06/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/08/2015
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/09/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/09/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 10/09/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 10/09/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/20/2015
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/20/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/20/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 10/21/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/21/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 10/26/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/26/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/26/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/27/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 11/02/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/16/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/15/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/17/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 01/07/2016
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/07/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/07/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 01/11/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/11/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/01/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/01/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/01/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/25/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/11/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law03/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.870. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2015)

Puerto Rico Chapter 9 Uniformity Act of 2015

Amends the federal bankruptcy code to treat Puerto Rico as a state under chapter 9 (Adjustment of the Debts of a Municipality).