There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

NOTICE Act
Notice of Observation Treatment and Implication for Care Eligibility Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

NOTICE Act
Notice of Observation Treatment and Implication for Care Eligibility Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

NOTICE Act
Notice of Observation Treatment and Implication for Care Eligibility Act

Short Titles as Introduced

NOTICE Act
Notice of Observation Treatment and Implication for Care Eligibility Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

NOTICE Act
Notice of Observation Treatment and Implication for Care Eligibility Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to require hospitals to provide certain notifications to individuals classified by such hospitals under observation status rather than admitted as inpatients of such hospitals.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
08/06/2015Became Public Law No: 114-42. (TXT | PDF)
08/06/2015Signed by President.
07/29/2015Presented to President.
07/27/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/27/2015Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5920-5921)
03/16/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 0 (Roll no. 115).(text: CR H1644)
03/13/2015Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
03/13/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-39, Part I.
02/11/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
08/06/2015Became Public Law No: 114-42. (TXT | PDF)
08/06/2015Signed by President.
07/29/2015HousePresented to President.
07/27/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/27/2015SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5920-5921)
03/17/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
03/16/2015-7:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 0 (Roll no. 115). (text: CR H1644)
03/16/2015-7:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/16/2015-7:05pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1650-1651)
03/16/2015-4:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/16/2015-4:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 876.
03/16/2015-4:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1644-1646)
03/16/2015-4:31pmHouseMr. Ryan (WI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/13/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 25.
03/13/2015HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
03/13/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-39, Part I.
02/26/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
02/26/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/16/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/13/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/11/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/11/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/11/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/11/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 02/11/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/24/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/24/2015

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/11/2015 Referred to
02/26/2015 Markup by
03/13/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-39
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/16/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/11/2015 Referred to
03/13/2015 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/13/2015 Referred to
Senate Finance03/17/2015 Referred to
07/27/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.876. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-42 (08/06/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on March 16, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Notice of Observation Treatment and Implication for Care Eligibility Act or the NOTICE Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to require a hospital or critical access hospital with an agreement with the Secretary of Health and Human Services to give each individual who receives observation services as an outpatient for more than 24 hours an adequate oral and written notification within 36 hours after beginning to receive them which:

  • explains the individual's status as an outpatient and not as an inpatient and the reasons why;
  • explains the implications of that status on services furnished (including those furnished as an inpatient), in particular the implications for cost-sharing requirements and subsequent coverage eligibility for services furnished by a skilled nursing facility;
  • includes appropriate additional information;
  • is written and formatted using plain language and made available in appropriate languages; and
  • is signed by the individual or a person acting on the individual's behalf (representative) to acknowledge receipt of the notification, or if the individual or representative refuses to sign, the written notification is signed by the hospital staff who presented it.