There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

American Research and Competitiveness Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

American Research and Competitiveness Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

American Research and Competitiveness Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to simplify and make permanent the research credit.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/20/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 274 - 145 (Roll no. 260).(text: CR H3410-3411)
05/14/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-113.
02/11/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
05/21/2015SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/20/2015-7:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/20/2015-7:17pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 274 - 145 (Roll no. 260). (text: CR H3410-3411)
05/20/2015-7:10pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 181 - 240 (Roll no. 259).
05/20/2015-3:17pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Neal motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Neal demanded the yeas and nays and pursuant to the order of the House of today, the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption until a time to be announced.
05/20/2015-3:17pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H3419)
05/20/2015-3:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Neal motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to extend the research and development tax credit for two years, through December 31, 2016.
05/20/2015-3:09pmHouseMr. Neal moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Ways and Means. (consideration: CR H3418; text: CR H3418)
05/20/2015-3:09pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H3418)
05/20/2015-2:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 880.
05/20/2015-2:09pmHouseORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. Ryan (WI) asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting a motion to recommit on H.R. 880 may be subject to postponement as though under clause 8 of rule 20.
05/20/2015-2:03pmHouseThe resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2262 and H.R. 880. In addition, the resolution provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from May 22, 2015, through May 29, 2015.
05/20/2015-2:03pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 273. (consideration: CR H3410-3419, H3490-3491)
05/20/2015-2:03pmHouseRule H. Res. 273 passed House.
05/19/2015-7:01pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 273 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2262 and H.R. 880. In addition, the resolution provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from May 22, 2015, through May 29, 2015.
05/14/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 79.
05/14/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-113.
02/12/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 12.
02/12/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/11/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
02/11/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/11/2015 Referred to
02/12/2015 Markup by
05/14/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-113

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.880. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/20/2015)

American Research and Competitiveness Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill revises and makes permanent after 2014 the research tax credit. The rate of such credit is modified to equal the sum of 20% of so much of the qualified research expenses for the taxable year as exceeds 50% of the average qualified research expenses for the three preceding taxable years, 20% of so much of the basic research payments for the taxable year as exceeds 50% of the average basic research payments for the three preceding taxable years, plus 20% of amounts paid by a business taxpayer to an energy research consortium for energy research. If a taxpayer has no qualified research expenses in any of the three preceding taxable years, the rate of the tax credit is reduced to 10% of current research expenses.

The bill also provides that in the case of an eligible small business (i.e., a corporation whose stock is not publicly traded, a partnership, or a sole proprietorship with annual gross receipts not exceeding $50 million in a three-year period), the research credit may offset alternative minimum tax liability.

(Sec. 3) The bill prohibits the entry of the budgetary effects of this Act on either PAYCO scorecard under the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010.