There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 141 Paloma Drive in Floresville, Texas, as the "Floresville Veterans Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/20/2015Became Public Law No: 114-33. (TXT | PDF)
07/20/2015Signed by President.
07/09/2015Presented to President.
07/08/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4894)
06/24/2015Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
06/15/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4357)
02/11/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
07/20/2015Became Public Law No: 114-33. (TXT | PDF)
07/20/2015Signed by President.
07/09/2015HousePresented to President.
07/09/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/08/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4894)
06/24/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 129.
06/24/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
06/24/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/16/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/15/2015-5:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/15/2015-5:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4357)
06/15/2015-5:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 891.
06/15/2015-5:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4357-4358)
06/15/2015-5:06pmHouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/19/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
05/19/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/11/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government.
02/11/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/11/2015 Referred to
05/19/2015 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/16/2015 Referred to
06/24/2015 Markup by
06/24/2015 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.891.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.891. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-33 (07/20/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 141 Paloma Drive in Floresville, Texas, as the "Floresville Veterans Post Office Building."