Text: H.R.893 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-30 (07/06/2015)

 
[114th Congress Public Law 30]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 423]]

               BOYS TOWN CENTENNIAL COMMEMORATIVE COIN ACT

[[Page 129 STAT. 424]]

Public Law 114-30
114th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration 
of the centennial of Boys Town, and for other purposes. <<NOTE: July 6, 
                          2015 -  [H.R. 893]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Boys Town 
Centennial Commemorative Coin Act. 31 USC 5112 note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Boys Town Centennial Commemorative 
Coin Act''.
SEC. 2. FINDINGS.

    Congress finds that--
            (1) Boys Town is a nonprofit organization dedicated to 
        saving children and healing families, nationally headquartered 
        in the village of Boys Town, Nebraska;
            (2) Father Flanagan's Boys Home, known as ``Boys Town'', was 
        founded on December 12, 1917, by Servant of God Father Edward 
        Flanagan;
            (3) Boys Town was created to serve children of all races and 
        religions;
            (4) news of the work of Father Flanagan spread worldwide 
        with the success of the 1938 movie, ``Boys Town'';
            (5) after World War II, President Truman asked Father 
        Flanagan to take his message to the world, and Father Flanagan 
        traveled the globe visiting war orphans and advising government 
        leaders on how to care for displaced children;
            (6) Boys Town has grown exponentially, and now provides care 
        to children and families across the country in 11 regions, 
        including California, Nevada, Texas, Nebraska, Iowa, Louisiana, 
        North Florida, Central Florida, South Florida, Washington, DC, 
        New York, and New England;
            (7) the Boys Town National Hotline provides counseling to 
        more than 150,000 callers each year;
            (8) the Boys Town National Research Hospital is a national 
        leader in the field of hearing care and research of Usher 
        Syndrome;
            (9) Boys Town programs impact the lives of more than 2 
        million children and families across America each year; and
            (10) December 12th, 2017, will mark the 100th anniversary of 
        Boys Town, Nebraska.
SEC. 3. COIN SPECIFICATIONS.

    (a) $5 Gold Coins.--The Secretary of the Treasury (referred to in 
this Act as the ``Secretary'') shall mint and issue not more

[[Page 129 STAT. 425]]

than 50,000 $5 coins in commemoration of the centennial of the founding 
of Father Flanagan's Boys Town, each of which shall--
            (1) weigh 8.359 grams;
            (2) have a diameter of 0.850 inches; and
            (3) contain 90 percent gold and 10 percent alloy.

    (b) $1 Silver Coins.--The Secretary shall mint and issue not more 
than 350,000 $1 coins in commemoration of the centennial of the founding 
of Father Flanagan's Boys Town, each of which shall--
            (1) weigh 26.73 grams;
            (2) have a diameter of 1.500 inches; and
            (3) contain 90 percent silver and 10 percent copper.

    (c) Half Dollar Clad Coins.--The Secretary shall mint and issue not 
more than 300,000 half dollar clad coins in commemoration of the 
centennial of the founding of Father Flanagan's Boys Town, each of which 
shall--
            (1) weigh 11.34 grams;
            (2) have a diameter of 1.205 inches; and
            (3) be minted to the specifications for half dollar coins 
        contained in section 5112(b) of title 31, United States Code.

    (d) Legal Tender.--The coins minted under this Act shall be legal 
tender, as provided in section 5103 of title 31, United States Code.
    (e) Numismatic Items.--For purposes of sections 5134 and 5136 of 
title 31, United States Code, all coins minted under this Act shall be 
considered to be numismatic items.
SEC. 4. DESIGN OF COINS.

    (a) In General.--The design of the coins minted under this Act shall 
be emblematic of the 100 years of Boys Town, one of the largest 
nonprofit child care agencies in the United States.
    (b) Designation and Inscriptions.--On each coin minted under this 
Act, there shall be--
            (1) a designation of the value of the coin;
            (2) an inscription of the year ``2017''; and
            (3) inscriptions of the words ``Liberty'', ``In God We 
        Trust'', ``United States of America'', and ``E Pluribus Unum''.

    (c) Selection.--The design for the coins minted under this Act shall 
be--
            (1) selected by the Secretary, after consultation with the 
        National Executive Director of Boys Town and the Commission of 
        Fine Arts; and
            (2) reviewed by the Citizens of Coinage Advisory Committee.
SEC. 5. ISSUANCE OF COINS.

    (a) Quality of Coins.--Coins minted under this Act shall be issued 
in uncirculated and proof qualities.
    (b) Mint Facility.--Only one facility of the United States Mint may 
be used to strike any particular quality of the coins minted under this 
Act.
    (c) Period for Issuance.--The Secretary may issue coins under this 
Act only during the period beginning on January 1, 2017, and ending on 
December 31, 2017.
SEC. 6. SALE OF COINS.

    (a) Sale Price.--The coins issued under this Act shall be sold by 
the Secretary at a price equal to the sum of--

[[Page 129 STAT. 426]]

            (1) the face value of the coins; and
            (2) the cost of designing and issuing the coins (including 
        labor, materials, dies, use of machinery, overhead expenses, 
        marketing, and shipping).

    (b) Bulk Sales.--The Secretary shall make bulk sales of the coins 
issued under this Act at a reasonable discount.
    (c) Prepaid Orders.--
            (1) In general.--The Secretary shall accept prepaid orders 
        for the coins minted under this Act before the issuance of such 
        coins.
            (2) Discount.--Sale prices with respect to prepaid orders 
        under paragraph (1) shall be at a reasonable discount.
SEC. 7. SURCHARGES.

    (a) In General.--All sales of coins issued under this Act shall 
include a surcharge as follows:
            (1) A surcharge of $35 per coin for the $5 coin.
            (2) A surcharge of $10 per coin for the $1 coin.
            (3) A surcharge of $5 per coin for the half dollar coin.

    (b) Distribution.--Subject to section 5134(f) of title 31, United 
States Code, all surcharges received by the Secretary from the sale of 
coins issued under this Act shall be paid to Boys Town to carry out Boys 
Town's cause of caring for and assisting children and families in 
underserved communities across America.
    (c) Audits.--Boys Town shall be subject to the audit requirements of 
section 5134(f)(2) of title 31, United States Code, with regard to the 
amounts received under subsection (b).
    (d) Limitation.--Notwithstanding subsection (a), no surcharge may be 
included with respect to the issuance under this Act of any coin during 
a calendar year if, as of the time of such issuance, the issuance of 
such coin would result in the number of commemorative coin programs 
issued during such year to exceed the annual two commemorative coin 
program issuance limitation under section 5112(m)(1) of title 31, United 
States Code (as in effect on the date of the enactment of this Act). The 
Secretary of the Treasury may issue guidance to carry out this 
subsection.
SEC. 8. FINANCIAL ASSURANCES.

    The Secretary shall take such actions as may be necessary to ensure 
that--
            (1) minting and issuing coins under this Act will not result 
        in any net cost to the Federal Government; and
            (2) no funds, including applicable surcharges, shall be 
        disbursed to any recipient designated in section 7 until the 
        total cost of designing and issuing all of the coins authorized 
        by this Act (including labor, materials, dies, use of machinery, 
        overhead expenses, marketing, and shipping) is recovered by

[[Page 129 STAT. 427]]

        the United States Treasury, consistent with sections 5112(m) and 
        5134(f) of title 31, United States Code.

    Approved July 6, 2015.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 893 (S. 301):
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 161 (2015):
            June 23, considered and passed House.
            June 25, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>