There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Constitutional Concealed Carry Reciprocity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To allow reciprocity for the carrying of certain concealed firearms.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/12/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/12/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/12/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (121)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/13/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 02/13/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/13/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/13/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/24/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/24/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 02/24/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/24/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/25/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/26/2015
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/26/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/02/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/04/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/16/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 03/16/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/16/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/19/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 04/13/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/13/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/13/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/15/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/15/2015
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 04/28/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 04/28/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/12/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/12/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 05/13/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/19/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 05/20/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/21/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/10/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/10/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/11/2015
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 06/23/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/07/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/31/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/05/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/11/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/12/2016
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/12/2016
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/12/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/12/2016
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 01/12/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/12/2016
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/12/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/12/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/12/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/02/2016
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/10/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/10/2016
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/10/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/10/2016
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/10/2016
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/14/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/14/2016
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 03/23/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/23/2016
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/23/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/12/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 04/12/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/15/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 04/18/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/19/2016
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/19/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/20/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/21/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/27/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/27/2016
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/27/2016
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 04/28/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 04/28/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/28/2016
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/28/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/28/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 04/28/2016
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/28/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/28/2016
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/28/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/28/2016
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/28/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/10/2016
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/10/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/10/2016
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/10/2016
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/10/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/10/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/10/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/10/2016
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/11/2016
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/11/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/13/2016
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/13/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/13/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 05/24/2016
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 05/25/2016
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/26/2016
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 06/07/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/07/2016
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/07/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 06/07/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 06/07/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/07/2016
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/07/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 06/09/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/10/2016
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/13/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/13/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/13/2016
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/16/2016
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/06/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/11/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/13/2016
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 07/25/2016
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/22/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/22/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 09/22/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 09/28/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/28/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 11/14/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 11/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/12/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.923. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/12/2015)

Constitutional Concealed Carry Reciprocity Act of 2015

Amends the federal criminal code to authorize a person who is not prohibited from possessing, transporting, shipping, or receiving a firearm under federal law, who is entitled and not prohibited from carrying a concealed firearm in his or her state of residence or who is carrying a valid state license or permit to carry a concealed weapon, and who is carrying a government-issued photographic identification document, to carry a concealed handgun (which has been shipped or transported in interstate or foreign commerce, other than a machine gun or destructive device) in any state in accordance with the restrictions of that state.

Provides that in a state that allows the issuing authority for licenses or permits to carry concealed firearms to impose restrictions on the carrying of firearms by individual license or permit holders, an individual carrying a concealed handgun under this Act shall be permitted to carry it according to the same terms authorized by an unrestricted license or permit issued by such state.