Text: H.R.960 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-280 (12/16/2016)

 
[114th Congress Public Law 280]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 130 STAT. 1424]]

Public Law 114-280
114th Congress

                                 An Act


 
Designate the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient 
clinic in Newark, Ohio, as the Daniel L. Kinnard VA Clinic. <<NOTE: Dec. 
                        16, 2016 -  [H.R. 960]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. FINDINGS.

    Congress finds the following:
            (1) Daniel L. Kinnard was born on October 21, 1949, in Mount 
        Vernon, Ohio.
            (2) While residing in Newark, Ohio, Daniel L. Kinnard 
        enlisted in the Army at Fort Hayes, Ohio, on November 14, 1966, 
        and served as a Specialist Fourth Class in the 101st Airborne 
        Division.
            (3) Specialist Kinnard was awarded the National Defense 
        Service Medal, Vietnam Service Medal, Vietnam Campaign Medal, 
        Parachutist Badge, Sharpshooter Badge with Rifle Bar, Bronze 
        Star for Valor, Purple Heart, Good Conduct Medal, and the Combat 
        Medical Badge.
            (4) Specialist Kinnard's citation for the Bronze Star said, 
        ``For heroism in combat against a hostile force in the Republic 
        of Vietnam on 17 February 1968. Specialist Four Kinnard 
        distinguished himself while attached as a medic on a combat 
        operation near Quang Tri, Republic of Vietnam. The point platoon 
        made contact with enemy positions in a hedgerow and two of the 
        point men were seriously wounded. Without hesitation, Specialist 
        Kinnard rushed through the heavy volume of enemy fire to reach 
        the wounded men. With complete disregard for his own personal 
        safety, Specialist Kinnard remained exposed to enemy fire while 
        he treated the wounded men. Once he administered first aid to 
        the wounded, Specialist Kinnard organized their evacuation under 
        fire. His personal bravery and devotion to duty were in keeping 
        with the highest traditions of the military service and reflect 
        great credit upon himself, his unit, and United States Army.''.
            (5) Specialist Kinnard was killed in action on March 9, 
        1968, while rendering aid to his fellow paratroopers.
SEC. 2. DANIEL L. KINNARD VA CLINIC.

    (a) Designation.--The Department of Veterans Affairs community-based 
outpatient clinic located in Newark, Ohio, shall after the date of the 
enactment of this Act be known and designated as the ``Daniel L. Kinnard 
VA Clinic''.

[[Page 130 STAT. 1425]]

    (b) References.--Any reference in a law, map, regulation, document, 
paper, or other record of the United States to the Department of 
Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic referred to in 
subsection (a) shall be deemed to be a reference to the Daniel L. 
Kinnard VA Clinic.

    Approved December 16, 2016.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 960:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 162 (2016):
            May 23, considered and passed House.
            Dec. 9, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>