There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Supporting Academic Freedom through Regulatory Relief Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Secretary of Education from engaging in regulatory overreach with regard to institutional eligibility under title IV of the Higher Education Act of 1965, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/29/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/13/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/13/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/13/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/02/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 03/06/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/06/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/06/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/06/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/16/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 03/16/2015
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/23/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/23/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/23/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/13/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/13/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 04/13/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 04/13/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/13/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/13/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/13/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/13/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/13/2015
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/16/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 04/16/2015
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 04/16/2015
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/16/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/21/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/05/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/05/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/05/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/05/2015
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/13/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/21/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 06/17/2015
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/02/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/02/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/03/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/13/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training04/29/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.970. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2015)

Supporting Academic Freedom through Regulatory Relief Act

Repeals certain Department of Education (ED) regulations that for purposes of determining whether a school is eligible to participate in programs under the Higher Education Act of 1965 (HEA): (1) require institutions of higher education (IHEs) and postsecondary vocational institutions (except religious schools) to be legally authorized by the state in which they are situated, (2) delineate what such legal authorization requires of states and schools, (3) impose standards and disclosure requirements on programs that prepare students for gainful employment in a recognized occupation, and (4) define "credit hour."

Prohibits ED from promulgating or enforcing any regulation or rule not in effect on the date of this Act's enactment regarding: (1) the state authorization for IHEs to operate within a state, (2) the definition or application of the term "gainful employment," or (3) a teacher preparation program accountability system. Ends that prohibition when a law is enacted that extends by at least two fiscal years the authorization or duration of one or more programs under the HEA.

Prohibits ED from promulgating or enforcing any regulation or rule that defines "credit hour" for any purpose under the HEA.

Prohibits ED from carrying out, developing, refining, promulgating, publishing, implementing, administering, or enforcing a postsecondary institution ratings system or any other performance system to rate IHEs.

Amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the HEA to authorize nonprofit IHEs to make payments to third-party entities for services that include student recruitment and are based on the amount of tuition that the IHE generates from student enrollment if the third-party entity: (1) is not affiliated with the IHE, (2) does not provide incentive payments to its employees for their success in enrolling students or securing financial aid for them, (3) is not paid by the IHE solely or separately for student recruitment services, and (4) will not make student recruitment information available to any other person or entity.