There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Yellowstone and Grand Teton Paddling Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Yellowstone and Grand Teton Paddling Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to promulgate regulations to allow the use of hand-propelled vessels on certain rivers and streams that flow in and through certain Federal lands in Yellowstone National Park, Grand Teton National Park, the John D. Rockefeller, Jr. Memorial Parkway, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/08/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-373.
02/13/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
12/08/2015Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 285.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/08/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-373.
10/08/2015Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/08/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/08/2015Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
10/08/2015Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
10/07/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/13/2015Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/13/2015 Referred to
10/08/2015 Markup by
12/08/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-373
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/16/2015 Referred to
10/08/2015 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans03/16/2015 Referred to
10/08/2015 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.974.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.974. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (12/08/2015)

Yellowstone and Grand Teton Paddling Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to promulgate regulations to allow the use of hand-propelled vessels on certain rivers and streams within: (1) the Yellowstone National Park in Idaho, Montana, and Wyoming; and (2) the Grand Teton National Park and the John D. Rockefeller, Jr. Memorial Parkway in Wyoming.

The regulations issued under this Act shall not consider any expansion of commercial use of hand-propelled vessels in the Parks.

When promulgating such regulations, the Department of the Interior shall consult with the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and the National Park Service to help ensure that the regulations make recreational use of hand-propelled vessels on the Gros Ventre River within the National Elk Refuge in Wyoming adjacent to Grand Teton National Park consistent with the requirements of the National Refuge System Administration Act of 1966.

Upon the issuance of final regulations, existing regulations prohibiting hand-propelled vessels on streams and rivers in Yellowstone National Park and Grand Teton National Park shall no longer have any force or effect.

Interior is authorized to recover all costs associated with monitoring the use of hand-propelled vessels, including the cost of inspecting and decontaminating vessels to prevent the introduction or spread of invasive or injurious species in such National Parks and the Memorial Parkway.