There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

English Language Unity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To declare English as the official language of the United States, to establish a uniform English language rule for naturalization, and to avoid misconstructions of the English language texts of the laws of the United States, pursuant to Congress' powers to provide for the general welfare of the United States and to establish a uniform rule of naturalization under article I, section 8, of the Constitution.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
03/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/13/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2015Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/24/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/24/2015
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/24/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/24/2015
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/24/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/24/2015
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/24/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/24/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/24/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/24/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/24/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/26/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/26/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/27/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/27/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/04/2015
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/04/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/04/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/04/2015
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/10/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/10/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/13/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/16/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/16/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/17/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/23/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/23/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/23/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/23/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 04/13/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 04/13/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/13/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/21/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/21/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/21/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 04/21/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/22/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/22/2015
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/23/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/01/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/13/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/13/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/13/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/13/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/15/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2015
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/22/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/01/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/01/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/04/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/07/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/08/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 07/10/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/21/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/28/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/09/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/09/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 09/11/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/30/2015
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/20/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/20/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 11/16/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/16/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/07/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/11/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 01/05/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/05/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/13/2016
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/02/2016
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/03/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/03/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/23/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/25/2016
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/26/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/01/2016
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/21/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/07/2016
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/07/2016
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/14/2016
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/15/2016
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/15/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/15/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/15/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/15/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 06/16/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 06/16/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 07/06/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/12/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/13/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary02/13/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.997. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2015)

English Language Unity Act of 2015

Establishes English as the official language of the United States.

Requires naturalization ceremonies and official functions of the U.S. government, subject to exceptions, to be conducted in English.

Declares that all citizens should be able to read and understand generally the English language text of U.S. laws.

Allows a person injured by a violation of this Act to obtain relief, including a declaratory judgment, in a civil action.

Declares that English language requirements and workplace policies, whether in the public or private sector, shall be presumptively consistent with U.S. laws. Requires any ambiguity in U.S. laws to be resolved in accordance with the rights retained by the people and the powers reserved to states under the Bill of Rights.

Directs the Department of Homeland Security to issue a proposed rule for uniform testing of the English language ability of candidates for naturalization based upon the principles that: (1) all citizens should be able to read and understand generally the English language text of the Declaration of Independence, the Constitution, and the laws of the United States; and (2) any exceptions to this standard should be limited to extraordinary circumstances, such as asylum.