Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/18/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, December 18, 2015, through Saturday, January 2, 2016, it stand adjourned sine die.

Declares that when the Senate:

  • adjourns on any day from Friday, December 18, 2015, through Tuesday, December 22, 2015, it stand adjourned sine die; and
  • recesses or adjourns on any day of the second session of the 114th Congress from Sunday, January 3, 2016, through Friday, January 8, 2016, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, January 11, 2016.