There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal collectively to the 65th Infantry Regiment, known as the "Borinqueneers".


Actions Overview (4)

Date
03/08/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1349)
02/23/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H837)
02/23/2016Committee on House Administration discharged.(consideration: CR H837)
02/09/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
03/09/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/08/2016SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1349)
02/24/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
02/23/2016-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/23/2016-7:07pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H837)
02/23/2016-7:06pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H837)
02/23/2016HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged. (consideration: CR H837)
02/23/2016-7:06pmHouseMr. Davis, Rodney asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H837)
02/09/2016HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
02/09/2016HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/09/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration02/09/2016 Referred to
02/23/2016 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.113.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.113. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/08/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center to be used on April 13, 2016, for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal to the 65th Infantry Regiment (Borinqueneers) in recognition of its pioneering military service, devotion to duty, and many acts of valor in the face of adversity.