There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Expressing support for the goal of ensuring that all Holocaust victims live with dignity, comfort, and security in their remaining years, and urging the Federal Republic of Germany to continue to reaffirm its commitment to this goal through a financial commitment to comprehensively address the unique health and welfare needs of vulnerable Holocaust victims, including home care and other medically prescribed needs.

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the goal of ensuring that all Holocaust victims live with dignity, comfort, and security in their remaining years, and urging the Federal Republic of Germany to reaffirm its commitment to this goal through a financial commitment to comprehensively address the unique health and welfare needs of vulnerable Holocaust victims, including home care and other medically prescribed needs.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/07/2016 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 363 - 0 (Roll no. 269).(text: CR H3475-3476)
04/21/2016 Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
06/08/2016 Senate Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
06/07/2016-6:53pm House The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/07/2016-6:53pm House On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 363 - 0 (Roll no. 269). (text: CR H3475-3476)
06/07/2016-6:31pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3490-3491)
06/07/2016-4:48pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/07/2016-4:24pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 129.
06/07/2016-4:24pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3475-3478)
06/07/2016-4:24pm House Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
05/18/2016 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/18/2016 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/28/2016 House Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2069-2070)
04/21/2016 House Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
04/21/2016 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/21/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/29/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/29/2016
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/10/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/10/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 05/10/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/10/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/10/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/10/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/10/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/10/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/10/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/10/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/10/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/10/2016
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/10/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 05/10/2016
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/10/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/10/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/10/2016
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/12/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/12/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/12/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/12/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/16/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/16/2016
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 05/16/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/16/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/16/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/17/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/17/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/17/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/18/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 05/18/2016
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/18/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/19/2016
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/19/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/26/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/26/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/07/2016
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/07/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/21/2016 Referred to
05/18/2016 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations06/08/2016 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (12)

  • Crime victims
  • Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
  • Europe
  • Germany
  • Government liability
  • Health programs administration and funding
  • Home and outpatient care
  • Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
  • Mental health
  • Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
  • War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.129. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/07/2016)

Urges the working group established by the Federal Republic of Germany and the Conference on Jewish Material Claims Against Germany to recognize the imperative to fund immediately and fully the medical, mental health, and long-term care needs of surviving Holocaust victims, with full transparency and accountability, to ensure all funds for Holocaust victims from the Federal Republic of Germany are administered efficiently, fairly, and without delay.

Urges the Federal Republic of Germany also to continue to reaffirm its commitment to fulfill its moral responsibility to Holocaust victims by:

  • ensuring that each Holocaust victim receives all of the prescribed medical care, home care, mental health care, and other vital services necessary to live in dignity; and
  • providing, without delay, additional financial resources to address the unique needs of Holocaust victims.