There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing official recognition of the massacre of 11 African-American soldiers of the 333rd Field Artillery Battalion of the United States Army who had been captured in Wereth, Belgium, during the Battle of the Bulge on December 17, 1944.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/06/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/11/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
07/06/2016Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/06/2016Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/06/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/08/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/08/2016
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/08/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/08/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 07/08/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/08/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/12/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/12/2016
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/12/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/12/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/12/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/12/2016
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/13/2016
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/13/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/13/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 07/13/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/13/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/14/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/14/2016
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/14/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/14/2016
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/14/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/14/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/25/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/25/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/25/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/06/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/06/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/06/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/06/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/06/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/06/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/08/2016
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/09/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/13/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/13/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/13/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 09/21/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/21/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/21/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/21/2016
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/22/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/22/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/22/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/28/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 09/28/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services07/06/2016 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel07/11/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.141. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/06/2016)

Recognizes on behalf of the United States the dedicated service and ultimate sacrifice of the 11 African-American soldiers of the 333rd Field Artillery Battalion of the United States Army who were massacred in Wereth, Belgium, during the Battle of the Bulge on December 17, 1944.

Calls on the Senate Armed Services Committee to correct the omission in the 1949 report of its subcommittee and appropriately recognize the Wereth 11.