There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the National Peace Officers Memorial Service and the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/23/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2417)
04/21/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 162).(text: CR H2333-2334)
04/20/2015Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-87.
03/19/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/27/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/23/2015SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2417)
04/22/2015SenateReceived in the Senate.
04/21/2015-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/21/2015-6:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 162). (text: CR H2333-2334)
04/21/2015-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2344-2345)
04/21/2015-4:35pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/21/2015-4:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 25.
04/21/2015-4:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2333-2335)
04/21/2015-4:28pmHouseMr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
04/20/2015HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 23.
04/20/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-87.
04/15/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/15/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/15/2015HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
03/20/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/19/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/19/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/19/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/19/2015 Referred to
04/15/2015 Markup by
04/20/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-87
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/20/2015 Referred to
04/15/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.Con.Res.25. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (04/23/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Permits the Grand Lodge of the Fraternal Order of Police and its auxiliary to sponsor a free public event on the Capitol grounds, namely:

  • the National Honor Guard and Pipe Band Exhibition on May 14, 2015, to allow law enforcement representatives to exhibit their ability to demonstrate Honor Guard programs and provide for a bag pipe exhibition; and
  • the 34th Annual National Peace Officers' Memorial Service on May 15, 2015, to honor the law enforcement officers who died in the line of duty during 2014.