There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the daisy as the flower for military caregivers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
08/13/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/21/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 05/21/2015
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 05/21/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/22/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/22/2015
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/26/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/29/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/29/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/29/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/02/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/02/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 06/02/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/08/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/08/2015
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/12/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/17/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/19/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/07/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/07/2015
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/28/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/08/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/21/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/13/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs05/21/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.49. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/21/2015)

Honors military caregivers of members of the Armed Forces and veterans for their service and sacrifice to the United States.

Encourages the people of the United States to show support to military families and the sacrifices endured by those families in service to the United States.

Recognizes the daisy as the flower for military caregivers.