There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress that an appropriate site in the Memorial Amphitheater in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial marker to honor the memory of those who have been awarded or are eligible for the Korean Defense Service Medal who are missing in action, are unaccounted for, or died in-theater.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
08/13/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/23/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/23/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/23/2015
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/24/2015
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/25/2015
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/08/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/16/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2015
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/27/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/27/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/27/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/27/2015
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 07/27/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/28/2015
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 07/28/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/28/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/29/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/31/2015
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/09/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/11/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/15/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/22/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/24/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/09/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 10/22/2015
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 10/22/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 10/22/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/03/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/16/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/17/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/12/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/10/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/12/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/12/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/12/2016
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/12/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 04/12/2016
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/12/2016
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/12/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/12/2016
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 04/21/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/21/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/21/2016
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/10/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 06/10/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2016
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/12/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/21/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services05/21/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/13/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.50.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.50. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/21/2015)

Expresses the sense of Congress that an appropriate site in the Memorial Amphitheater in Arlington National Cemetery should be provided for a memorial marker (to be paid for with private funds) to honor the memory of those who have been awarded or are eligible for the Korean Defense Service Medal who are missing in action or unaccounted for, or who died in-theater, if the Secretary of the Army has exclusive authority to approve the site and design of the marker.