Summary: H.Con.Res.72 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (08/05/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Tuesday, August 4, 2015, through Friday, September 4, 2015, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, September 8, 2015.

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Tuesday, August 4, 2015, through Saturday, September 5, 2015, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Tuesday, September 8, 2015.