There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress that a carbon tax would be detrimental to the United States economy.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/10/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 237 - 163, 2 Present (Roll no. 295).(text: CR H3669)
10/29/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
06/13/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/10/2016-12:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/10/2016-12:51pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 237 - 163, 2 Present (Roll no. 295). (text: CR H3669)
06/10/2016-12:45pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3693)
06/10/2016-10:18amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At conclusion of debate on H.Con.Res. 89, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Black demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the resolution until later in the legislative day.
06/10/2016-10:17amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H3676)
06/10/2016-9:16amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Con. Res. 89.
06/10/2016-9:16amHouseResolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4775, H. Con. Res. 89, and H. Con. Res. 112.
06/10/2016-9:16amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 767. (consideration: CR H3669-3677)
06/07/2016-7:34pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 767 Reported to House. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4775, H. Con. Res. 89, and H. Con. Res. 112.
10/29/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
10/29/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/19/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/12/2016
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/12/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/12/2016
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/12/2016
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 01/12/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/12/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 01/12/2016
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 01/12/2016
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/12/2016
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/12/2016
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/28/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/28/2016
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 01/28/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/2016
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/10/2016
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/23/2016
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/24/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/24/2016
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/26/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/26/2016
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/29/2016
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/29/2016
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/01/2016
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/01/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/01/2016
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/01/2016
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/02/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/02/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/02/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/02/2016
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/03/2016
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/03/2016
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/10/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/10/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/10/2016
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/10/2016
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/10/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/15/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/12/2016
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/12/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/12/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/12/2016
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/12/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/12/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 04/12/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/12/2016
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/12/2016
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/12/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/12/2016
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/15/2016
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/15/2016
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/15/2016
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/15/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/19/2016
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/19/2016
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/19/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/19/2016
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/19/2016
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/19/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/21/2016
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/21/2016
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/21/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 04/26/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/26/2016
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/27/2016
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 04/29/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/29/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/03/2016
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/10/2016
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/10/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/16/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/16/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/17/2016
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/26/2016
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 05/31/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means10/29/2015 Referred to
Senate Finance06/13/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.89. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/10/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses the sense of Congress that a carbon tax would be detrimental to American families and businesses and is not in the best interest of the United States.