Summary: H.Con.Res.92 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/05/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, November 5, 2015, through Thursday, November 12, 2015, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, November 16, 2015.

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Tuesday, November 10, 2015, through Friday, November 13, 2015, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, November 16, 2015.