There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives and a conditional recess or adjournment of the Senate.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/05/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7843-7844; text as passed Senate: CR S7844)
11/05/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H8145)
11/05/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/06/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/05/2015SenateReceived in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7843-7844; text as passed Senate: CR S7844)
11/05/2015-1:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/05/2015-1:28pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H8145)
11/05/2015-1:26pmHouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8145)
11/05/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 11/23/2020 text has not been received for H.Con.Res.92 - Providing for a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives and a conditional recess or adjournment of the Senate.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.92.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.92. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/05/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, November 5, 2015, through Thursday, November 12, 2015, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, November 16, 2015.

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Tuesday, November 10, 2015, through Friday, November 13, 2015, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, November 16, 2015.