Summary: H.Con.Res.95 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/19/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, November 19, 2015, through Wednesday, November 25, 2015, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, November 30, 2015.

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, November 19, 2015, through Tuesday, November 24, 2015, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, November 30, 2015.