There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Marriage Protection Amendment

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to marriage.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/12/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/12/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/12/2015Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1017)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/12/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/12/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/12/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/12/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 02/20/2015
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/24/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/03/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 03/10/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/13/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/03/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/17/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/07/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/12/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.32.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.32. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/12/2015)

Constitutional Amendment

Marriage Protection Amendment

Defines marriage in the United States as consisting only of the union of a man and a woman. Prohibits either the U.S. Constitution or the constitution of any state from being construed to require that marriage or the legal incidents of marriage be conferred upon any other union.