There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Appointing the day for the convening of the second session of the One Hundred Fourteenth Congress.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/18/2015Became Public Law No: 114-108. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2015Signed by President.
12/18/2015Presented to President.
12/17/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8830; text as passed Senate: CR S8830)
12/15/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9322)
12/15/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
12/18/2015Became Public Law No: 114-108. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2015Signed by President.
12/18/2015HousePresented to President.
12/18/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8830; text as passed Senate: CR S8830)
12/16/2015SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/15/2015-7:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/15/2015-7:04pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9322)
12/15/2015-7:04pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9322)
12/15/2015-7:04pmHouseMr. McCarthy asked unanimous consent to consider as introduced.
12/15/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 10/23/2018 text has not been received for H.J.Res.76 - Appointing the day for the convening of the second session of the One Hundred Fourteenth Congress.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.76.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.76. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-108 (12/18/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This joint resolution convenes the second session of the 114th Congress at noon on January 4, 2016.