There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting efforts to ensure that students have access to debt-free higher education.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/21/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
04/21/2015Introduced in House

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/21/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/21/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 04/21/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/21/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/21/2015
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 04/21/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/27/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/27/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/27/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2015
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/29/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/29/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/11/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/11/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/11/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/11/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/11/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/11/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/11/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/11/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/11/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/11/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 06/11/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/11/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/18/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/18/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/08/2015
Del. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 09/08/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/08/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 09/08/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/08/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/08/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/08/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/09/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/22/2015
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/22/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/22/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/22/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/22/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/22/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/01/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/01/2015
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/01/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/20/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/11/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/23/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/23/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce04/21/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.214. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/21/2015)

Expresses support for efforts to:

  • ensure that all students have access to debt-free higher education upon graduation from public institutions of higher education;
  • provide support to states to make increased investments in higher education that will result in lower tuition and costs for students;
  • increase financial aid to help students afford attending college without taking on debt;
  • encourage innovation by states and institutions of higher education to cut costs for students and make college more affordable by increasing efficiency and enabling speedy and less-costly degree completion; and
  • reduce the burden of existing student loan debt.