There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 2028) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 2029) making appropriations for military construction, the Department of Veterans Affairs, and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from May 4, 2015, through May 11, 2015.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/29/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 186 (Roll no. 176).(text: CR H2506-2507)
04/28/2015The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-94, by Mr. Woodall.
04/28/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
04/29/2015-2:16pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/29/2015-2:16pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 186 (Roll no. 176). (text: CR H2506-2507)
04/29/2015-1:47pmThe previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H2515)
04/29/2015-12:46pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 223.
04/29/2015-12:43pmConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2506-2515)
04/28/2015Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 27.
04/28/2015-9:03pmThe resolution provides for a modified-open rule for both H.R. 2028 and H.R. 2029.
04/28/2015The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-94, by Mr. Woodall.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules04/28/2015 Reported original measure H. Rept. 114-94

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.223. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2015)

Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.R. 2028) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 2029) making appropriations for military construction, the Department of Veterans Affairs, and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from May 4, 2015, through May 11, 2015.