There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing deepest condolences to and solidarity with the people of Nepal following the devastating earthquake on April 25, 2015.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/29/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
05/21/2015Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/20/2015Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
05/20/2015Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/13/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
04/29/2015Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
04/29/2015Introduced in House

Cosponsors (114)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/29/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/29/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/29/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 04/29/2015
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 04/29/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/29/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/29/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 04/29/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/30/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/30/2015
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/30/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/30/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/30/2015
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/30/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/30/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/12/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/12/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/12/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/12/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/02/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/02/2015
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/12/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/08/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/29/2015 Referred to
05/21/2015 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific05/13/2015 Referred to
05/20/2015 Markup by
05/20/2015 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.235.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.235. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/29/2015)

Expresses deepest condolences to and solidarity with the people of Nepal following the devastating earthquake on April 25, 2015.

Supports the Administration's efforts to coordinate an immediate U.S. humanitarian response.

Commends the efforts and honors the sacrifice of the men and women engaged in the response, including the citizens and government of Nepal, the United States, and international humanitarian and nongovernmental organizations.

Urges the Administration, in coordination with the government of Nepal and other donors, to provide emergency relief and reconstruction efforts in Nepal.