There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster-care system, and encouraging Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in the foster-care system.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/05/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/11/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
05/05/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
05/05/2015Introduced in House

Cosponsors (131)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/05/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/05/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/05/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/05/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 05/05/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 05/05/2015
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 05/05/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/08/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/08/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/08/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/08/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/08/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/14/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/10/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/05/2015
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/26/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/05/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources05/11/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.251. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/05/2015)

Recognizes the National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges that children face in the foster-care system and supports the designation of National Foster Care Month.