There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding Srebrenica.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/08/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4904-4905)
06/12/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/08/2015-4:23pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/08/2015-4:23pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4904-4905)
07/08/2015-3:57pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 310.
07/08/2015-3:57pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4904-4908)
07/08/2015-3:57pmMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
06/12/2015Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
06/12/2015Introduced in House

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/12/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 06/12/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/12/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/16/2015
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 06/16/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/16/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/17/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/17/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/17/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/17/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/23/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/23/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/23/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/23/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/23/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/23/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/23/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/23/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/24/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/24/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/24/2015
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/25/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/25/2015
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/25/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/25/2015
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/07/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/07/2015
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/07/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/07/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 07/07/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/07/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/07/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/07/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 07/07/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/07/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/07/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/07/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/07/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/07/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/08/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/08/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/12/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.310. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/08/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Affirms that the policies of aggression and ethnic cleansing implemented by Serb forces in Bosnia and Herzegovina from 1992 to 1995 meet the terms of genocide.

Urges the Atrocities Prevention Board, a U.S. interagency committee established by the Administration in 2012, to study the lessons of Srebrenica and issue guidance on how to prevent similar incidents from recurring in the future.

Encourages the United States to reaffirm its policy of supporting the independence and territorial integrity of Bosnia and Herzegovina, peace and stability in southeastern Europe, and the right of all people living in the region to return to their homes and enjoy the benefits of democratic institutions, as well as to know the fate of missing relatives and friends.

Recognizes the achievement of the International Commission for Missing Persons in accounting for those missing in conflicts or natural disasters around the world.

Welcomes the arrest and transfer to the International Criminal Tribunal for the former Yugoslavia of all persons indicted for war crimes, crimes against humanity, genocide and grave breaches of the 1949 Geneva Conventions, particularly those of Radovan Karadzic and Ratko Mladic.

Asserts that it is in the U.S. national interest that those individuals who are responsible for these crimes should continue to be held accountable for their actions.

Honors the thousands of innocent people killed or executed at Srebrenica in Bosnia and Herzegovina in July 1995, along with all individuals who were victimized during the conflict and genocide in Bosnia and Herzegovina from 1992 to 1995, as well as the foreign nationals who risked and in some cases lost their lives during their defense of human rights and fundamental freedoms.