There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing "National Atomic Veterans Day" on July 16.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/23/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
08/05/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
07/23/2015Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/23/2015Introduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/07/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 03/02/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/26/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs07/23/2015 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs08/05/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.377.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.377. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/23/2015)

Recognizes National Atomic Veterans Day and acknowledges the important role played by the Atomic Veterans in the nation's defense.