Text: H.Res.377 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/23/2015)

 
[Congressional Bills 114th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 377 Introduced in House (IH)]

114th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 377

        Recognizing ``National Atomic Veterans Day'' on July 16.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             July 23, 2015

Mr. Brat submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
                     Committee on Veterans' Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
        Recognizing ``National Atomic Veterans Day'' on July 16.

Whereas approximately 250,000 veterans of the United States, while serving in 
        the active military, naval, or air service during the period beginning 
        in 1945 and ending in 1963, witnessed and participated in at least 235 
        atmospheric nuclear weapons tests conducted in the Pacific Ocean and the 
        Southwestern United States or served in Hiroshima or Nagasaki during the 
        period of the occupation of Japan by the military forces of the United 
        States immediately following World War II;
Whereas these atomic veterans patriotically served their country, meeting the 
        needs of national defense during this critical period in history;
Whereas July 16 is the anniversary of ``Trinity'', the first detonation of an 
        atomic weapon, which took place at Alamogordo Air Force Base in New 
        Mexico on July 16, 1945;
Whereas the health of many of the atomic veterans and of many of the natural 
        children of such veterans may have been adversely affected by the 
        exposure of such veterans to ionizing radiation from the detonation of 
        atomic or nuclear weapons;
Whereas the Congress recognizes the patriotism and dedication of the atomic 
        veterans and the importance of resolving the issues arising from the 
        problems caused by the exposure of the atomic veterans to ionizing 
        radiation;
Whereas many atomic veterans were prevented by secrecy laws or oaths from 
        seeking medical care or disability compensation from the United States 
        Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for conditions they may have 
        developed as a result of radiation exposure;
Whereas in 1996, the United States Congress repealed the Nuclear Radiation and 
        Secrecy Agreements Act, freeing atomic veterans to describe their 
        military involvement in nuclear testing in order to file for VA 
        benefits;
Whereas atomic veterans may be eligible for free medical care from the VA and 
        compensation in the form of a partial or full service-connected 
        disability allowance, including potential payments to a surviving spouse 
        or children;
Whereas the National Association of Atomic Veterans was formed in 1979 to help 
        atomic veterans obtain medical care and assistance;
Whereas, on May 4, 1983, the Senate passed by unanimous consent S.J. Res. 68, a 
        joint resolution to authorize and request the President to designate 
        July 16, 1983, as ``National Atomic Veterans' Day''; and on June 30, 
        1983, the resolution passed the House of Representatives by voice vote, 
        and on July 15, 1983, President Ronald Reagan signed it into Public Law 
        98-54;
Whereas, on July 15, 1983, President Ronald Regan therefore did designate, in 
        accordance with Public Law 98-54, July 16, 1983, as ``National Atomic 
        Veterans' Day'', a day ``dedicated to those patriotic Americans who 
        through their participation in these tests helped lead the United States 
        to the forefront of technology in defense of our great Nation and the 
        freedoms we as Americans hold so dear.'';
Whereas the designation by President Reagan was only for the single day of July 
        16, 1983, and not in each succeeding year; and
Whereas the Virginia House of Delegates, with the Senate concurring, did 
        designate July 16, in 2015, and in each succeeding year, as ``National 
        Atomic Veterans Day'' in Virginia: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) recognizes ``National Atomic Veterans Day''; and
            (2) acknowledges the important role played by the Atomic 
        Veterans in the defense of the Nation.
                                 <all>

Share This