There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Condemning the cowardly attacks on innocent men, women, and children in northeastern Nigeria by Boko Haram and urging a peaceful and credible national election.

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the cowardly attack on innocent men, women, and children in the northeastern Nigerian town of Baga.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/23/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1829)
01/27/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
03/23/2015-5:49pmThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
03/23/2015-5:49pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/23/2015-5:49pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1829)
03/23/2015-5:25pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 53.
03/23/2015-5:25pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1829-1832)
03/23/2015-5:25pmMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
02/27/2015Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
02/27/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/25/2015Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations Discharged.
02/11/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations.
01/27/2015Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/27/2015Introduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/27/2015 Referred to
02/27/2015 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations02/11/2015 Referred to
02/25/2015 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.Res.53.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.53. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/23/2015)

Supports the people of Nigeria, especially the men, women, and children in the northeastern Nigerian town of Baga who were victimized, trafficked, and murdered by the terrorist group Boko Haram.

Condemns Boko Haram for its violent attacks on civilian targets in Nigeria.

Encourages the government of Nigeria to: (1) strengthen efforts to protect civilians from Boko Haram; and (2) work with the United States and other governments such as Chad, Niger, and Cameroon to defeat Boko Haram.

Supports U.S. offers of assistance to Nigeria in the search for the school girls abducted by Boko Haram.