There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation of a "Small Business Saturday" and supporting efforts to increase awareness of the value of locally owned small businesses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/19/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
11/19/2015Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
11/19/2015Introduced in House

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 11/19/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 11/19/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/19/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 12/01/2015
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/01/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/01/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/01/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 12/01/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/01/2015
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 12/01/2015
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/01/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 12/02/2015
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 12/09/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/27/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business11/19/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.534. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/19/2015)

Expresses support for: (1) the designation of a Small Business Saturday, (2) efforts to encourage consumers to shop locally, and (3) efforts to increase awareness of the value of locally owned small businesses and their impact on the U.S. economy.