There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Affirming the support of the United States for Macedonia's accession to the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO).


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/27/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/03/2015Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E295)
02/11/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
01/27/2015Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/27/2015Introduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/27/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/02/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/02/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/04/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 02/24/2015
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/24/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/27/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/21/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/21/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/21/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/22/2015
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/23/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/27/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 04/30/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 04/30/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/13/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/13/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/14/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/20/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/02/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 06/23/2015
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/09/2015
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 07/21/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/28/2015
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/03/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/27/2015 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats02/11/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.56.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.56. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/27/2015)

Supports Macedonia's aspirations to join the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO).

Recognizes the cooperation between Vermont and Macedonia and the joint military partnership between the Vermont National Guard and the Army of Macedonia.

Recognizes the significant benefits of closer economic and political ties between NATO members and Macedonia.

Appreciates Macedonia's efforts in advancing peace, democracy, and stability.

Calls on the Administration, the Department of State, and European allies to work with Greece and NATO allies to ensure that bilateral disputes do not impede Macedonia's NATO accession.

Urges NATO members to formally extend an invitation to Macedonia to join NATO at one of the next meetings of the North Atlantic Council or NATO Summit in Poland in 2016.