There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning violence, bigotry, and hateful rhetoric towards Muslims in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/17/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/15/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
12/17/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
12/17/2015Introduced in House

Cosponsors (145)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/17/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/17/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 12/17/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 12/17/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/18/2015
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/18/2015
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 12/18/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/18/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/18/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/18/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/18/2015
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/18/2015
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/18/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/18/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/05/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/05/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/05/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 01/05/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 01/05/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/05/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/05/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 01/05/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/05/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/05/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/06/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/06/2016
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/06/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 01/06/2016
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/06/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 01/06/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 01/06/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/07/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/08/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/08/2016
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/08/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/08/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/08/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 01/11/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/11/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/11/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/12/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/12/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/12/2016
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/12/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/13/2016
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/13/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/13/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/01/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 02/01/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/01/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/01/2016
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/01/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/01/2016
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/01/2016
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/01/2016
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/02/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/02/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/03/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/08/2016
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/08/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/10/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/23/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/23/2016
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/13/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/19/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/20/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/21/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/21/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/26/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 04/26/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/26/2016
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/26/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/28/2016
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/10/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 05/16/2016
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 05/16/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/23/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary12/17/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice01/15/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.569.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.569. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/17/2015)

Expresses condolences for the victims of anti-Muslim hate crimes.

Declares that the House of Representatives:

  • confirms its dedication to the rights and dignity of all citizens;
  • denounces the increase of hate speech and hate crimes targeted against mosques, Muslims, or those perceived to be Muslim; and
  • recognizes the positive contributions made by the U.S. Muslim community to U.S. society.

Declares that the civil rights and liberties of all U.S. citizens, including Muslims in the United States, should be protected.

Urges law enforcement authorities to work to prevent hate crimes and to prosecute the perpetrators of such crimes.

Reaffirms the inalienable rights of every citizen to live without fear and intimidation and to practice freedom of faith.