There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing disapproval of the occupation of Malheur National Wildlife Refuge by a group of armed individuals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/05/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/06/2016Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
01/05/2016Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/05/2016Introduced in House

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 01/06/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/06/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 01/06/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/06/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/06/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 01/06/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/06/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/06/2016
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 01/07/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/07/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/07/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/07/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/07/2016
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/07/2016
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/07/2016
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 01/07/2016
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 01/07/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/07/2016
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/07/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/07/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/07/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 01/07/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 01/07/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/07/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/07/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/08/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/08/2016
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 01/08/2016
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 01/08/2016
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/08/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/08/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/08/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/11/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/11/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/11/2016
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/11/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/12/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/12/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/12/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 01/12/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/12/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 01/12/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/02/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/02/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/02/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/02/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/02/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/02/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/02/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/05/2016 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands01/06/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.575.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.575. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/05/2016)

Condemns the unlawful, armed occupation of the Malheur National Wildlife Refuge in Oregon and calls on those involved to end their occupation and surrender to law enforcement authorities immediately.