There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Amending the Rules of the House of Representatives to require that a standing committee (or subcommittee thereof) hearing be held whenever there is a moment of silence in the House for a tragedy involving gun violence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/20/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/20/2016Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
04/20/2016Introduced in House

Cosponsors (142)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/20/2016
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/20/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 04/20/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/20/2016
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/20/2016
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 04/20/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/20/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/20/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/27/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/27/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/27/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 04/27/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/27/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/16/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/16/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/26/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/26/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/13/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/13/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/13/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/13/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/13/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/13/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/16/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/16/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/16/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/16/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/16/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 06/16/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/16/2016
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/16/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/16/2016
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/16/2016
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/16/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/16/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/16/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/22/2016
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/22/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/05/2016
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 11/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules04/20/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.694.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.694. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/20/2016)

Declares that, whenever a moment of silence related to a tragedy involving gun violence occurs on the floor of the House, the Speaker shall announce on the next legislative day the standing committee (or subcommittee) designated to hold a hearing on the event.