There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Urging the United States Soccer Federation to immediately eliminate gender pay inequity and treat all athletes with the same respect and dignity.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/24/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/24/2016Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
05/24/2016Introduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/24/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 05/24/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/25/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/25/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/25/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/26/2016
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/03/2016
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/03/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/09/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/24/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.746. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/24/2016)

Urges the United States Soccer Federation to immediately end gender pay inequity and to treat all athletes with respect and dignity.

Expresses support for an end to pay discrimination based on gender and the strengthening of equal pay protections.