There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Terminating a Select Investigative Panel of the Committee on Energy and Commerce.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/08/2016Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
06/08/2016Introduced in House

Cosponsors (162)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/08/2016
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/08/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/08/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/08/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/08/2016
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/08/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/08/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/08/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 06/08/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/09/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/09/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/09/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/09/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/09/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/09/2016
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/09/2016
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/09/2016
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/09/2016
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/09/2016
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/09/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/09/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/09/2016
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/09/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/09/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/09/2016
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/09/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/09/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/09/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/09/2016
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/09/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2016
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/09/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/09/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/09/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/09/2016
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/09/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/09/2016
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/09/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/09/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/09/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/09/2016
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/09/2016
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/09/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/09/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/09/2016
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/09/2016
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/09/2016
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/09/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/09/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/09/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/09/2016
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/09/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/09/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/09/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/09/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/09/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/09/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/09/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/09/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/09/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/09/2016
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/09/2016
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/09/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/09/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/09/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/09/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/09/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/09/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/09/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/09/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/09/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/10/2016
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/10/2016
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/10/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/10/2016
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/10/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/10/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/10/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/10/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/10/2016
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/10/2016
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/10/2016
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/10/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/10/2016
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/10/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/10/2016
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/10/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/10/2016
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/10/2016
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/10/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/10/2016
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/13/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/13/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/13/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/13/2016
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/13/2016
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/13/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/13/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/13/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/13/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/13/2016
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/13/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/14/2016
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/14/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/14/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/15/2016
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/15/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/15/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/15/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2016
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/16/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/16/2016
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/16/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 06/16/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/16/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/16/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/16/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/16/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/21/2016
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/21/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/21/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/21/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/21/2016
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/21/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/21/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/21/2016
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/21/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/21/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/21/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/21/2016
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/21/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/21/2016
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/21/2016
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/21/2016
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/21/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/21/2016
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 06/21/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/21/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/21/2016
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/21/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/21/2016
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/24/2016
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/24/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 09/06/2016
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 11/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules06/08/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.769. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2016)

Terminates the Select Investigative Panel of the Committee on Energy and Commerce.