Text: H.Res.808 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/06/2016)

 
[Congressional Bills 114th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 808 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






114th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 808

 Calling on the Government of the Islamic Republic of Iran to release 
     Iranian-Americans Siamak Namazi and his father, Baquer Namazi.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                              July 6, 2016

Mr. Royce (for himself, Mr. Connolly, Ms. Ros-Lehtinen, Mr. Honda, Mr. 
Issa, Mr. Engel, Mr. DeSantis, Mr. Capuano, and Mr. Mica) submitted the 
 following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign 
                                Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Calling on the Government of the Islamic Republic of Iran to release 
     Iranian-Americans Siamak Namazi and his father, Baquer Namazi.

Whereas dual citizen of the United States and Iran Siamak Namazi studied 
        international relations at Tufts University and urban planning at 
        Rutgers University;
Whereas Siamak Namazi was named as a Young Global Leader by the World Economic 
        Forum in 2007;
Whereas Siamak Namazi was a former Public Policy Fellow at the Woodrow Wilson 
        Center for International Scholars, was a business consultant, and most 
        recently worked in the petroleum industry for a company based in Dubai, 
        United Arab Emirates;
Whereas Siamak Namazi traveled from Dubai to Tehran to visit relatives in July 
        2015;
Whereas when departing, Siamak Namazi was denied exit in mid-July 2015;
Whereas Siamak Namazi was interrogated for 3 months before he was detained on 
        October 15, 2015, without any charges;
Whereas Siamak Namazi remains under arrest in Evin Prison and no charges have 
        been filed against him;
Whereas dual citizen of the United States and Iran, Baquer Namazi, father of 
        Siamak Namazi was detained on February 22, 2016, and is also being held 
        in Evin Prison;
Whereas Baquer Namazi worked for UNICEF in New York and served as the UNICEF 
        Representative to Somalia, Kenya, and Egypt;
Whereas Baquer Namazi is a recognized leader of humanitarian causes, especially 
        poverty eradication, through his United Nations work and his post-
        retirement civil society activities;
Whereas Secretary of State John Kerry responded on February 25, 2016, to a 
        question about the detention of Siamak Namazi, ``I am very familiar with 
        this and I am engaged on it specifically''; and
Whereas on January 16, 2016, the Government of the Islamic Republic of Iran 
        released 5 United States citizens, Jason Rezaian of California, Saeed 
        Abedini of Idaho, Amir Mirzaei Hekmati of Michigan, Matthew Trevithick 
        of Massachusetts, and Nosratollah Khosravi-Roodsari: Now, therefore, be 
        it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) calls on the Government of the Islamic Republic of Iran 
        to unconditionally release Siamak and Baquer Namazi 
        immediately;
            (2) urges the President, the allies of the United States, 
        and the United Nations to raise the cases of Siamak and Baquer 
        Namazi with officials of the Government of the Islamic Republic 
        of Iran at every opportunity and undertake efforts to secure 
        their immediate release;
            (3) encourages the President to utilize appropriate 
        measures against the Government of the Islamic Republic of Iran 
        if Siamak and Baquer Namazi are not released; and
            (4) expresses sympathy to the family of Siamak and Baquer 
        Namazi for their anguish and expresses hope that their ordeal 
        can be brought to an end in the near future.
                                 <all>