There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting respect for human rights and encouraging inclusive governance in Ethiopia.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/12/2016Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/12/2016Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
09/12/2016Introduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/12/2016
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 09/12/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 09/12/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 09/12/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/21/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/21/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/28/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/28/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/14/2016
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/14/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/14/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/14/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/14/2016
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/14/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/14/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 11/14/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/14/2016
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 11/15/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/15/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/15/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2016
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 11/15/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/15/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 11/15/2016
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/15/2016
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 11/15/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/15/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/15/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/16/2016
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/16/2016
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/16/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/16/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/16/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/30/2016
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/30/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/06/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/06/2016
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/06/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs09/12/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.861. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/12/2016)

Condemns: (1) the killing of peaceful protesters and excessive use of force by Ethiopian security forces; (2) the detention of journalists, students, activists and political leaders who exercise their constitutional rights to freedom of assembly and expression through peaceful protests; and (3) the abuse of the Anti-Terrorism Proclamation to stifle political and civil dissent and journalistic freedoms.

Urges protesters in Ethiopia to refrain from violence.

Calls on the government of Ethiopia to:

  • end the use of excessive force by security forces;
  • investigate the killings and excessive use of force that took place as a result of protests in the Oromia and Amhara regions;
  • release dissidents, activists, and journalists who have been imprisoned for exercising constitutional rights;
  • respect the right to peaceful assembly and guarantee freedom of the press;
  • engage in open consultations with citizens regarding its development strategy;
  • allow a United Nations rapporteur to conduct an independent examination of the state of human rights in Ethiopia; and
  • investigate and report on the circumstances surrounding the September 3, 2016, shootings and fire at Qilinto Prison.

Calls on such government to repeal proclamations that:

  • can be used to harass or prohibit funding for organizations that investigate human rights violations, engage in peaceful political dissent, or advocate for greater political freedoms;
  • prohibit those displaced from their land from seeking judicial redress;
  • permit the detention of peaceful protesters and political opponents who legally exercise their rights to freedom of expression and association; and
  • limit peaceful nonprofit operations in Ethiopia.

Calls on: (1) the Department of State to review security assistance, and improve oversight of U.S. assistance, to Ethiopia; and (2) the U.S. Agency for International Development to lead efforts to develop a strategy to support improved democracy and governance in Ethiopia.

Supports the peaceful efforts of the Ethiopian people to exercise their constitutional rights.