There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Personal Care Products Safety Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to ensure the safety of cosmetics.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/20/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
09/22/2016Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Hearings held.
04/20/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2274-2275)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/20/2015
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/27/2015
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/30/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 10/01/2015
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/08/2015
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/07/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/20/2015 Referred to
09/22/2016 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.1014.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1014. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/20/2015)

Personal Care Products Safety Act

This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require cosmetics companies to register their facilities with the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) and to submit to the FDA cosmetic ingredient statements that include the amounts of a cosmetic's ingredients. Companies must pay a facility registration fee based on their annual gross sales of cosmetics. The collected fees can only be used for cosmetic safety activities.

If the FDA determines that a cosmetic has a reasonable probability of causing serious adverse health consequences, it may prohibit the cosmetic's distribution by suspending the cosmetic ingredient statement. If other cosmetics from the same facility may be affected, the FDA may prohibit distribution from the facility by suspending the facility's registration.

The FDA must review the safety of at least five cosmetic ingredients each year, and it may establish conditions for safe use of an ingredient, including a limit on the amount of the ingredient or a requirement for a warning label. A cosmetic cannot be sold if it contains an ingredient that is not safe, not safe under the recommended conditions of use, or not safe in the amount present in the cosmetic.

Cosmetics companies are required to report to the FDA any serious adverse health event associated with their cosmetics.

The FDA must:

  • develop and implement cosmetic manufacturing standards that are consistent with existing national and international standards,
  • be allowed to inspect a company's cosmetic safety records,
  • recall a cosmetic that is likely to cause serious adverse health consequences, and
  • encourage cosmetic safety testing practices that minimize the use of animals.