There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

PACE Act
Protecting Affordable Coverage for Employees Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to provide States with flexibility in determining the size of employers in the small group market.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/27/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
05/18/2016Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-675.
04/27/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/27/2015
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/07/2015
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/10/2015
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/11/2015
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/11/2015
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/16/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/16/2015
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/17/2015
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/17/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/28/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/28/2015
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 07/30/2015
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/30/2015
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 07/30/2015
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/30/2015
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/30/2015
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 07/30/2015
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/30/2015
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/30/2015
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/30/2015
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/05/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 08/05/2015
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 08/05/2015
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 08/05/2015
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 08/05/2015
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 08/05/2015
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 08/05/2015
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 08/05/2015
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/09/2015
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/09/2015
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/09/2015
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 09/09/2015
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 09/09/2015
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 09/09/2015
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/09/2015
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/09/2015
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 09/09/2015
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 09/10/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/10/2015
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/10/2015
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/17/2015
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/17/2015
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/24/2015
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/24/2015
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/24/2015
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/29/2015
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/01/2015
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 10/01/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/27/2015 Referred to
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship05/18/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1099. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/27/2015)

Protecting Affordable Coverage for Employees Act or the PACE Act

This bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) and Public Health Service Act to include employers with 51 to 100 employees as large employers for purposes of health insurance markets.

PPACA is amended to give states the option to treat these employers as small employers. Currently, employers with 51 to 100 employees are small employers, but before January 1, 2016, states have the option to treat them as large employers. (Under PPACA, health insurance offered in the small group market must meet certain requirements that do not apply to the large group market, including the requirement to cover the essential health benefits.)