There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to exempt application of JSA attribution rule in case of existing agreements.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2016By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-426. Minority views filed.
12/07/2016Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. Without written report.
05/04/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
12/20/2016By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-426. Minority views filed.
Action By: Senate
12/07/2016Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 714.
Action By: Senate
12/07/2016Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. Without written report.
06/25/2015Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/04/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/04/2015 Referred to
06/25/2015 Markup by
12/07/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-426

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1182. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (12/07/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

(Sec. 1) This bill exempts broadcast television stations from the Federal Communications Commission's (FCC's) amended joint sales agreement (JSA) rules if the stations were parties to a JSA that was in effect on the effective date of the amendment adopted by the FCC on March 31, 2014.

Under the FCC's amended rule, a television station that sells more than 15% of the weekly advertising time of another station in the same market is attributed an ownership interest subject to ownership limitations. The bill exempts stations from being considered in violation of such ownership limitations by reason of the amended rule if they were a party to an existing JSA that was in effect on the effective date of the amendment.