There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Patient Access to Disposable Medical Technology Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Patient Access to Disposable Medical Technology Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide coverage of certain disposable medical technologies under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2015Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 114-105.
05/07/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/30/2015Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 184.
Action By: Senate
07/30/2015Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 114-105.
06/24/2015Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/07/2015Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/07/2015
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/12/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance05/07/2015 Referred to
06/24/2015 Markup by
07/30/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-105

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1253. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/30/2015)

Patient Access to Disposable Medical Technology Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to direct the Department of Health and Human Services to make a separate payment, calculated according to a specified formula, to a home health agency for an applicable disposable device when furnished on or after January 1, 2017 to an individual who receives home health services for which payment is made under Medicare.

An "applicable disposable device" is one that is:

  • a disposable negative pressure wound therapy device that is an integrated system composed of a non-manual vacuum pump, a receptacle for collecting exudate, and dressings for the purposes of wound therapy; and
  • a substitute for, and used in lieu of, a negative pressure wound therapy durable medical equipment item that is an integrated system of a negative pressure vacuum pump, a separate exudate collection canister, and dressings that would otherwise be covered for individuals for such wound therapy.

The Government Accountability Office shall study:

  • the value of disposable devices to the Medicare program and Medicare beneficiaries as well as the role of disposable devices as substitutes for durable medical equipment, and
  • the impact of the payment under this Act for applicable disposable devices.