There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Electronic Health Fairness Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Electronic Health Fairness Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Electronic Health Fairness Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act with respect to the treatment of patient encounters in ambulatory surgical centers in determining meaningful EHR use, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/05/2015 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6425; text as passed Senate: CR S6425)
07/30/2015 Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-106.
05/14/2015 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
09/08/2015-8:29pm House Held at the desk.
09/08/2015-2:05pm House Received in the House.
08/06/2015 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2015 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6425; text as passed Senate: CR S6425)
07/30/2015 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 185.
07/30/2015 Senate Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-106.
Action By: Committee on Finance
06/24/2015 Senate Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Finance
05/14/2015 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/14/2015
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/22/2015
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/18/2015
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/22/2015
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/07/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance05/14/2015 Referred to
06/24/2015 Markup by
07/30/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-106

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (5)

  • Health information and medical records
  • Home and outpatient care
  • Medicare
  • Surgery and anesthesia

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1347. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/05/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on July 30, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Electronic Health Fairness Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to prohibit, for a payment year after 2015, any patient encounter of an eligible professional occurring at an ambulatory surgical center from being treated as such an encounter in determining whether an eligible professional qualifies as a meaningful electronic health record (EHR) user.

Terminates this prohibition three years after the Department of Health and Human Services determines, through notice and comment rulemaking, that certified EHR technology is applicable to the ambulatory surgical center setting.