There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XI of the Social Security Act to clarify waiver authority regarding programs of all-inclusive care for the elderly (PACE programs).


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
11/05/2015Became Public Law No: 114-85. (TXT | PDF)
11/05/2015Signed by President.
10/26/2015Presented to President.
10/21/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7079)
08/05/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6425; text as passed Senate: CR S6425)
07/30/2015Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-108.
05/18/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/05/2015Became Public Law No: 114-85. (TXT | PDF)
11/05/2015Signed by President.
10/26/2015SenatePresented to President.
10/21/2015-6:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/21/2015-6:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7079)
10/21/2015-6:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1362.
10/21/2015-6:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7079-7080)
10/21/2015-6:10pmHouseMr. Brady (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/11/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/08/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/08/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/08/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/08/2015-2:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/06/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6425; text as passed Senate: CR S6425)
07/30/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 187.
07/30/2015SenateCommittee on Finance. Reported by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-108.
06/24/2015SenateCommittee on Finance. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/18/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 05/18/2015
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/18/2015
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/18/2015
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/18/2015
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/22/2015
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/23/2015
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/07/2015

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance05/18/2015 Referred to
06/24/2015 Markup by
07/30/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-108
House Ways and Means09/08/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce09/08/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/11/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1362. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-85 (11/05/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on July 30, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This bill amends part A (General Provisions) of title XI of the Social Security Act to authorize the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to waive applicable general and Medicaid requirements of the Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE) in order to conduct demonstration projects through the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation (CMS Innovation Center) that involve PACE.

HHS may not, as part of a CMS Innovation Center demonstration, waive: (1) the requirement to offer items and services under Medicare and Medicaid without limitation to PACE program enrollees, and (2) certain requirements regarding enrollment in and disenrollment from PACE programs.