There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Child Nicotine Poisoning Prevention Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Child Nicotine Poisoning Prevention Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Child Nicotine Poisoning Prevention Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Child Nicotine Poisoning Prevention Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Nicotine Poisoning Prevention Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to require special packaging for liquid nicotine containers, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Consumer Product Safety Commission to promulgate a rule to require child safety packaging for liquid nicotine containers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/28/2016Became Public Law No: 114-116. (TXT | PDF)
01/28/2016Signed by President.
01/19/2016Presented to President.
01/11/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H227)
12/10/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
04/13/2015Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-12.
01/08/2015Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/28/2016Became Public Law No: 114-116. (TXT | PDF)
01/28/2016Signed by President.
01/19/2016SenatePresented to President.
01/11/2016-3:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/11/2016-3:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H227)
01/11/2016-3:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 142.
01/11/2016-3:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H227-229)
01/11/2016-3:48pmHouseMrs. Brooks (IN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/11/2015-12:16pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/11/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/11/2015-11:00amHouseReceived in the House.
12/10/2015SenateS.Amdt.2925 Amendment SA 2925 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2015SenateS.Amdt.2925 Amendment SA 2925 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Nelson. (consideration: CR S8614; text: CR S8614) To amend the title.
12/10/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2015SenateS.Amdt.2924 Amendment SA 2924 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2015SenateS.Amdt.2924 Amendment SA 2924 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Nelson. (consideration: CR S8614; text: CR S8614) In the nature of a substitute.
12/10/2015SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8614)
12/10/2015SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8613-8614; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S8613)
04/13/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 35.
04/13/2015SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-12.
04/13/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 35.
02/26/2015SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/08/2015SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S107-108; text of measure as introduced: CR S108)

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/08/2015 Referred to
02/26/2015 Markup by
04/13/2015 Reported by S. Rept. 114-12

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.142. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-116 (01/28/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 10, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Child Nicotine Poisoning Prevention Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill requires any nicotine provided in a liquid nicotine container sold, offered for sale, manufactured for sale, distributed in commerce, or imported into the United States to be packaged in accordance with the Consumer Product Safety Commission's (CPSC's) standards and testing procedures for special packaging that is difficult for children under five years of age to open or to obtain harmful contents from. The requirement must be treated as a standard for the special packaging of a household substance under the Poison Prevention Packaging Act of 1970.

"Liquid nicotine container" is defined to: (1) include a package from which nicotine in a solution or other form is accessible through normal and foreseeable use by a consumer and that is used to hold soluble nicotine in any concentration; and (2) exclude a sealed, pre-filled, and disposable container of nicotine in a solution or other form in which such container is inserted directly into an electronic cigarette, electronic nicotine delivery system, or other similar product, if the nicotine in the container is inaccessible through customary or reasonably foreseeable handling or use, including reasonably foreseeable ingestion or other contact by children.

The bill applies to any form of chemical nicotine, including any salt or complex, regardless of whether the chemical is naturally or synthetically derived.

The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must consult with the CPSC if HHS maintains, enforces, imposes, or continues in effect any packaging requirement for liquid nicotine containers, including a child-resistant packaging requirement.